Financial history DOOSTAN

Charity Number: 1139464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £100.92k £11.39k £6.68k £3.34k £102.12k
Total expenditure £75.45k £27.24k £9.73k £10.81k £55.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A