Financial history THE ROAD OPERATORS SAFETY COUNCIL

Charity number: 1140150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £76.96k £17.43k £51.10k £52.69k £55.99k
Total expenditure £79.68k £68.18k £61.33k £62.89k £48.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A