Trustees THE ROAD OPERATORS SAFETY COUNCIL
Charity number: 1140150

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN EDWARD HAYES MILLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Alexander Burch | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Cole | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Payne | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Carney | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Charles Smith | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH MACKIE OBE | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER SEYMOUR HEAPS | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.