DONCASTER SCOPE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- People With Disabilities
- Doncaster
Governance
- 02 March 1972: Standard registration
- 06 October 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DONCASTER AND DISTRICT SPASTICS SOCIETY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £421 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 22 November 2005 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JANUARY 1972 AS AMENDED 25 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 21 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
A. TO PROVIDE, CAUSE TO BE PROVIDED OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND WELFARE OF SPASTICS (WHICH EXPRESSION SHALL MEAN AND INCLUDE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF CEREBRAL PALSY). (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE DONCASTER AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window