VISION FOR A NATION FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of health and relief of those in need by reason of age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage,for the benefit of the public, in particular but without limitation by means of the provision, including via fund-raising, of low cost eye glasses or other optical aids to such persons in low- and middle-income countries worldwide, at an affordable cost.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- Rwanda
Governance
- 31 January 2011: Standard registration
- 11 May 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 11 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1081695 VISION ACTION
- VFAN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.95m | £847.47k | £947.26k | £1.35m | £317.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68m | £816.55k | £742.55k | £955.91k | £1.49m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £8.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.15m | £551.10k | £669.55k | £974.22k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £804.12k | £294.99k | £275.46k | £361.91k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £1.39k | £2.25k | £3.14k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £184 | £0 | £0 | £8.11k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.66m | £792.90k | £733.80k | £952.64k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £20.14k | £23.64k | £8.76k | £3.27k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £49.69k | £5.52k | £17.37k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN EITHER CASE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY MEANS OF THE PROVISION OF LOW COST EYE GLASSES OR OTHER OPTICAL AIDS TO SUCH PERSONS IN LOW AND MIDDLE INCOME COUNTRIES WORLDWIDE, AT A COST AFFORDABLE TO SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window