Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, WEST KENSINGTON.
Charity number: 1139480

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kyra Bryan | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth-Anne Haldane | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Butler | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Frances Davies-McAlear | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Laura Ireland | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Pearson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Walworth | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Richard Green | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Gabrysia Cooper | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Jonathan Sharp | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.