THE SOUTH WALES POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief in cases of financial need to those members who are sick, convalescent, disabled or infirm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 10 March 1972: Standard registration
- THE SOUTH WALES CONSTABULARY BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Detective Inspector Simon Daniel Morgan | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chief Inspector Emma Fox | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chief Superintendent Stephen Jones | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.36k | £36.61k | £53.58k | £34.50k | £32.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.74k | £51.97k | £41.56k | £24.10k | £38.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 475 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18/02/1972 AS AMENDED ON 08/02/1979 AS AMENDED ON 25/04/2005 AS AMENDED ON 02 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY THE PROVISIONS OF FUNDS, INFORMATION, ADVICE, SERVICES, FACILITIES, RESOURCES, EQUIPMENT OR OTHER SUPPORT FOR THEIR NEEDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GLAMORGAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Wales Police Headquarters
Cowbridge Road
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF31 3SU
- Phone:
- 01656655555
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window