THE CENTRE PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre Project aims to reduce isolation and promote well-being. Current activities include - My connect ' Community Hub' - Centre Kitchen - Social eating - Support, information, advocacy, signposting and referrals - Day services for adults with learning difficulties - Activities such as, games, art therapy, day trips and IT classes - The Freedom Youth Club - Community Food bank
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicester City
Governance
- 07 March 2011: Standard registration
- THE CENTRE PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Akua Sai | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abiodun Egbetokun | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Cobb | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Frimpong | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor ROBERT NORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADRIAN OPPON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.64k | £133.52k | £151.80k | £245.69k | £204.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.39k | £118.80k | £132.49k | £211.53k | £200.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.50k | £38.48k | £45.30k | £34.50k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 OCTOBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 3 MARCH 2011 as amended on 13 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE SUCH ACTIVITIES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE TO THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN LEICESTER AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
LEICESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CENTRE PROJECT
1 ALFRED PLACE
LEICESTER
LE1 1EB
- Phone:
- 01162554013
- Email:
- info@centreproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window