SPACE4AUTISM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPACE4AUTISM is run by parents/carers for a place to meet people and share experiences and knowledge. We hold monthly meetings and also small presentations and family activities; all with some fun thrown in for good measure. At each meeting there is an update of important information and dates for your diary. We also run over 300 activities per year. see www.space4autism.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 12 May 2011: Standard registration
- 25 September 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 September 2023: Funds transferred to 1189689 SPACE4AUTISM
- SPACE (Working name)
- SPACE (EAST CHESHIRE ASC PARENTS SUPPORT) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.71k | £402.50k | £370.12k | £272.70k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £175.52k | £309.67k | £421.79k | £233.77k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £18.77k | £22.10k | N/A | £74.93k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £104.00k | £16.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS ON THE AUTISM SPECTRUM AND THEIR FAMILIES PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE AREA OF CHESHIRE EAST BOROUGH COUNCIL, WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF ASC (AUTISTIC SPECTRUM CONDITION) BY: 1. PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO SUPPORT AND ENABLE PARENTS OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH ASC TO MAXIMISE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEIR OFFSPRING. 2. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH ASC AND THEIR FAMILIES, BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION. 3. PROVIDING WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT. 4. PROVIDING RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH ASC AND THEIR FAMILIES. (NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008)
Area of benefit
PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE AREA OF CHESHIRE EAST BOROUGH COUNCIL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window