Trustees UPMINSTER BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1141721

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV MARK LEONARD DAVISON | Chair | 24 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Jayne Meech | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Gaye Bastin | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Richard Shorter | Trustee | 03 January 2022 |
|
|||||
ROBERT BURGIN | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHIPPERFIELD | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Margo Connor | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
COLIN DESMOND BROCKELSBY | Trustee | 16 March 2011 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.