Accounts and annual returns MOTHER NATURE UNLIMITED

Charity number: 1141118
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 September 2024 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 July 2023 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 July 2023 526 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required