THE NEWCASTLE AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Presentation of musical plays, operettas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 06 March 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Dyer | Chair | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Dyer | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carla Thomas | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Lawton | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Birks | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.06k | £26.87k | £52.53k | £14.04k | £40.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.20k | £31.55k | £54.77k | £6.56k | £56.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JANUARY 1972
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS, TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Grace Road
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST4 8FN
- Phone:
- 07528936624
- Email:
- Mike@tilg.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window