Financial history HELP COUNSELLING CENTRE

Charity number: 1140721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £159.20k £104.47k £121.56k £195.05k £253.98k
Total expenditure £147.19k £147.53k £155.67k £197.98k £252.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A