ROSEBERRY COMMUNITY CONSORTIUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing education, support and outreach activities to young people in the Tees Valley area. We focus on music, singing and dancing, keep fit, anti bullying techniques, martial arts and revision classes for school curriculum support We have a full gym, music rooms, podcast/tv studio a recording studio , a traverse wall for rock climbing. We produce films and videos, made by our users.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 16 June 2011: Standard registration
- COMMUNITY CONSORTIUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL WAYNE SCOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PRITTHIJIT DATTA | Trustee | 19 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL RHEINPRECHT | Trustee | 19 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JASON GREEN | Trustee | 19 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARK DAVID BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADAM SAYERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.79k | £9.90k | £9.72k | £35.69k | £71.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.82k | £6.00k | £11.07k | £30.99k | £37.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.77k | £20.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 November 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 January 2022 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/12/2010 AS AMENDED ON 02/06/2011 as amended on 20 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Roseberry Community consotium
78 Skinner Street
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Cleveland
TS18 1EG
- Phone:
- 07804368585
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window