CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND

Charity number: 1140097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting the mission and ministry of the Church of England especially by supporting poorer dioceses with ministry costs, providing funds to support mission activities, paying for bishops' ministry and some cathedral costs, administering the legal framework for pastoral reorganisation and closed church buildings, paying clergy pensions for service prior to 1998 and running the clergy payroll.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHURCH COMMISSIONERS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

26 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cyrus Stokes Gentry Trustee 25 March 2025
None on record
Sir Robert James Buckland Trustee 18 February 2025
None on record
Marsha de Cordova MP Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Robert Zampetti Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
The Revd Preb Amatu Christian-Iwuagwu Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Rev Sarah Jane Geileskey Trustee 01 January 2024
ST MARGARET'S CHARITIES FOR THE NEEDY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARETS, IPSWICH
Received: On time
St Edmundsbury Cathedral Trust
Received: On time
Richard Denno Trustee 01 January 2024
THE LIVERPOOL DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.MARK'S HAYDOCK
Received: On time
ST. HELENS GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Catharine Alison Rhodes Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Rt Revd Pete Wilcox Trustee 01 January 2024
RIDLEY HALL, CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
Dr Nicholas Land Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Dame Kate Barker Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Jenny Buck Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Christopher Hancock Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Rt Revd Stephen David Lake Trustee 19 October 2022
SOWTER CLERICAL LIBRARY
Received: On time
SARUM COLLEGE
Received: On time
SARUM ST MICHAEL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Remi Olu-Pitan Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
The Very Revd Rogers Govender Trustee 01 May 2022
MANCHESTER MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
VOLITION COMMUNITY
Received: On time
THE BURNEY FUND (ICW CHETHAM'S LIBRARY)
Received: On time
MANCHESTER COUNCIL FOR COMMUNITY RELATIONS
Received: On time
CHETHAM'S HOSPITAL SCHOOL AND LIBRARY
Received: 39 days late
THE NICHOLLS HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
CANON RICHSON'S EXHIBITION FUND
Received: On time
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL CHOIR SCHOOLS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE MILLENNIUM QUARTER TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE BENNETT STREET EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Rt Revd Graham Usher Trustee 01 December 2021
THE NORWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
Nigel TIMMINS Trustee 03 April 2021
None on record
Busola Sodeinde Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
MOST REVD AND RT HON STEPHEN GEOFFREY COTTRELL Trustee 09 July 2020
THE YORK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ARCHBISHOPS' COUNCIL
Received: On time
Very Revd Mark Bonney Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
ROSALIND MORAG ELLIS KC Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Rt Revd Vivienne Faull Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Alan Smith Trustee 08 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH ROXETH (HARROW)
Received: On time
Rev CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL SMITH Trustee 27 July 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT ALBAN THE MARTYR, HOLBORN WITH SAINT PETER, SAFFRON HILL
Received: On time
STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ST URSULA'S HOME
Received: On time
BROMFIELD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
SUZANNE AVERY Trustee 28 February 2017
THE PENNY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £175.44m £134.82m £148.13m £148.46m £192.12m
Total expenditure £289.02m £319.64m £226.34m £246.25m £494.35m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.02m £1.20m £1.19m £1.24m £194.13k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £171.50m £132.48m £144.79m £143.32m £188.27m
Income - Other £1.92m £1.14m £2.14m £3.91m £3.65m
Income - Legacies £4.84k £0 £659 £147 £378
Expenditure - Charitable activities £211.78m £244.08m £142.18m £186.81m £387.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds £77.24m £75.56m £84.16m £59.44m £107.26m
Expenditure - Governance £1.52m £1.33m £1.85m £937.70k £1.08m
Expenditure - Grants institution £88.36m £138.69m £120.98m £154.60m £188.95m
Expenditure - Investment management £76.78m £75.56m £84.16m £48.46m £87.27m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £121.64m £126.41m £125.05m £123.98m £136.99m
Long-term investments £7.77bn £8.03bn £9.15bn £9.67bn £9.97bn
Other assets £940.01m £1.26bn £1.07bn £1.28bn £1.15bn
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£127.71m -£133.80m -£118.88m -£83.91m -£81.16m
Total liabilities £1.71bn £1.71bn £1.59bn £1.93bn £2.07bn

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHURCH HOUSE
GREAT SMITH STREET
LONDON
SW1P 3AZ
Phone:
02078981000