Financial history SURREY LIFELONG LEARNING PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1143680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £389.46k £390.39k £476.70k £444.57k £508.04k
Total expenditure £375.15k £402.07k £470.62k £462.57k £489.46k
Income from government contracts £170.00k £154.31k £195.99k £272.06k £20.00k
Income from government grants £59.29k £69.59k £20.00k £111.19k £264.80k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £506.60k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £761
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £678
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £486.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0