Financial history STRETFORD GRAMMAR SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1140228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.04k £1.90k £2.85k £5.39k £5.69k
Total expenditure £4.12k £123 £128 £412 £669
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A