Accounts and annual returns CHESTER CAT CARE

Charity number: 1139910
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 January 2014 21 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 January 2014 Not Required
Annual return 23 January 2013 19 June 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 January 2013 23 December 2013 30 days late
Annual return 23 January 2012 28 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 January 2012 Not Required