THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DUNSTAN WITH HOLY CROSS, CANTERBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Promotes the mission of the church in the parish; pastoral, social, ecumenical. 2. Involves members of the parish in worship at the church, and in being part of the comunity of St Dunstans. 3. Raises funds to maintain the fabric of the church (a grade 1 listed building) and the church hall. 4. Supports charitable activities both within and outside the parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
41 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 10 February 2011: Previously excepted registration
- ST DUNSTAN'S PCC, CANTERBURY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jo Sue Richards | Chair | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Blamey | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Henry Shaw | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Hugh Cockburn | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jennifer Emily Beatrice Walpole | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laurienne Louisa Edwards | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Claire Trewby | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Palmer | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY HOWARD PARSONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH MARY PARSONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.31k | £82.69k | £80.64k | £92.43k | £110.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.38k | £99.94k | £83.98k | £100.84k | £90.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BENEFICE OFFICE
St. Dunstans Church Hall
80 London Road
CANTERBURY
CT2 8LS
- Phone:
- 01227786109
- Email:
- dmpbenefice@gmail.com
- Website:
-
dunstanmildredpeter.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window