Accounts and annual returns TEALBY SOCIETY

Charity number: 501475
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 16 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 07 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required