SCHOOLS FOR KENYA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Renovation and construction of schools in Kenya
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kenya
Governance
- 06 June 2011: Standard registration
- 15 August 2017: Funds received from 1150978 TEACHING IN KENYA - THINKING OF CHILDREN
- SFK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Stephenson | Chair | 22 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jill Halman | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John F Halman | Trustee | 30 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DIANA STEPHENSON | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
|||||
David Goddard Lord | Trustee | 22 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.76k | £1.52k | £3.09k | £15.59k | £24.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.89k | £4.58k | £34.88k | £7.11k | £18.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 June 2021 | 257 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 14 June 2021 | 257 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/11/2010
Charitable objects
SCHOOLS FOR KENYA WORKS TO SUPPORT AND IMPROVE THE EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES OF CHILDREN AT BOTH PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOL LEVEL BY PROVIDING FUNDS FOR THE BUILDING, RENOVATION, IMPROVEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF SCHOOL BUILDINGS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN KENYA.
Area of benefit
KENYA
Contact information
- Address:
-
School House
Longshoot Road
Lower Withington
Macclesfield
SK11 9DX
- Phone:
- 01477571975
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window