JOY TO THE WORLD FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1139832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Gives grants to organisations and individuals

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 25 October 2023

Total income: £1,122
Total expenditure: £1,122

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LEOPOLD SEDAR SENGHOR DAUD Chair 28 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/10/2019 25/10/2020 25/10/2021 25/10/2022 25/10/2023
Total gross income £8.86k £0 £0 £998 £1.12k
Total expenditure £8.86k £0 £0 £998 £1.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 October 2023 25 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 25 October 2022 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 25 October 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 25 October 2020 04 January 2022 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 25 October 2019 07 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 CLIFFORD ROAD
BRISTOL
BS16 4LR
Phone:
07455013864