TRANSFORMATION FOR VETERANS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to provide veterans and their families respite and rejuvenation at a relaxing retreat. We will focus on their wellbeing, providing bespoke services and support by assessing their skills and needs gaps thereby aiding their resettlement into the community and empowering them to achieve their true potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 April 2011: Standard registration
- SFH AND/OR S4H (Working name)
- SANCTUARY FOR HEROES (Previous name)
- SANCTUARY FOR VETERANS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Flynn | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Russell John O'Shea | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Winston Wagstaff | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.91k | £67.43k | £26.00k | £12.84k | £11.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.61k | £81.64k | £59.00k | £18.89k | £12.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 APR 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 SEP 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
4 THE FOLLOWING CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING (IN ORDER OF PREFERENCE); A) TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF EX-SERVICE MEN AND WOMEN AND/OR INJURED ARMED FORCES PERSONNEL IN THE UK WHO HAVE BEEN INJURED OR HAVE PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS AND/OR ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED (1) BY THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION FOR THEMSELVES, THEIR SPOUSES OR PARTNERS, CHILDREN AND CARERS; AND (2) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE AIMS PROVISIONS WILL ALSO INCLUDE A MENTORING, COACHING AND COUNSELLING SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF EX-SERVICE MEN AND WOMEN AND ARMED FORCES PERSONNEL AND THEIR SPOUSES, PARTNERS AND FAMILIES; AND (3) TRAINING, COACHING AND MENTORING FOR THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT TO ENABLE THE BENEFICIARIES TO GAIN WORK AND EMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT. B) TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH AND FURTHER EDUCATION OF THOSE IN CHESHIRE, MERSEYSIDE AND GREATER MANCHESTER IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE (1) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE AIMS PROVISIONS WILL ALSO INCLUDE A MENTORING, COACHING AND COUNSELLING SERVICE AS WELL AS TRAINING AND MENTORING TO ENABLE THE BENEFICIARIES TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sovereign House
York Hill Farm
Chester Road
Little Budworth
Tarporley
Cheshire
- Phone:
- 01829760065
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window