Financial history Gorleston Pavilion Trust Ltd

Charity number: 1142375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.58k £32.39k £20.51k £19.57k £69.02k
Total expenditure £23.08k £41.62k £5.62k £8.74k £71.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £14.53k £8.00k N/A N/A £500