ARMY SAILING ASSOCIATION - THORNEY ISLAND SAILING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) To "promote the efficiency of the armed forces of the Crown" by providing facilities for the sport of sailing. (2) To provide community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for the sport of sailing. (3) To advance the education and training, in particular for young people, by providing facilities for the sport of sailing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 10 January 2011: Standard registration
- ASA - TISC (Working name)
- THORNEY ISLAND SAILING CLUB (Working name)
- THORNEY SAILING CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Robert Dunn | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Susan Robinson | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Giles Eric Tewkesbury MBE | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Jones | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Harley | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hempsell | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julia Charlotte Wilkinson | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Smith | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMMA DUNN | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Andrew Desgrand | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Travers Rudd | Trustee | 09 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edward Nigel Baylis | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.26k | £119.62k | £148.41k | £174.48k | £174.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.79k | £130.70k | £117.68k | £181.35k | £166.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.44k | £11.99k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 04 DEC 2010
Charitable objects
(1) TO "PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN" BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF SAILING. (2) TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF SAILING. (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING, IN PARTICULAR FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF SAILING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thorney Island Sailing Club
Church Road
Thorney Island
EMSWORTH
PO10 8DS
- Phone:
- 01243 371731
- Email:
- secretary@tisc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window