Trustees ARMY SAILING ASSOCIATION - THORNEY ISLAND SAILING CLUB
Charity number: 1139736

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Robert Dunn | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Susan Robinson | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Giles Eric Tewkesbury MBE | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Jones | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Harley | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hempsell | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julia Charlotte Wilkinson | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Smith | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMMA DUNN | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Andrew Desgrand | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Travers Rudd | Trustee | 09 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Edward Nigel Baylis | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.