SIMPLY LIMITLESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of Simply Limitless continue to be: 1 The provision of facilities for recreation and leisure 2 The advancement of education 3 The relieve the needs of homeless people in such ways as are charitable
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 16 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HANNAH LUCY WEBB | Chair | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ANTHONY ZACAROLI | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
FAEEZ RAJAH | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE SUSAN DAWES | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.41k | £301.76k | £228.71k | £360.57k | £344.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £230.52k | £301.75k | £228.69k | £361.19k | £344.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 17 NOV 2010 MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/03/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN WYRE FOREST AND WORCESTERSHIRE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ADULTS, YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN LIVING IN WYRE FOREST AND WORCESTERSHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, TRAINING AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AND ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (C) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF HOMELESS PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED IN WYRE FOREST AND WORCESTERSHIRE IN SUCH WAYS AS ARE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
WYRE FOREST AND WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Walter Nash Road West
Kidderminster
Worcestershire
DY11 7QY
- Phone:
- 01562751144
- Email:
- info@simply-limitless.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window