THE ASSOCIATION OF DANCE OF THE AFRICAN DIASPORA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADAD continues to develop and showcase high quality programmes with dance forms rooted from the African Diaspora for the public benefit, raising profiles for artists. Programme include providing bursaries for professional development fellowships, celebratory regional festival and tour and research roadshows in partnerships. It also provided information and volunteer opportunities to the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 April 2011: Standard registration
- ADAD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH ROSE PALMER MA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christpher Rodriguez | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/09/2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS AND THE WORK OF THE ARTISTS IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DANCE AND THE WORK OF DANCE-ARTISTS OF THE AFRICAN DIASPORA
Contact information
- Address:
-
One Dance UK
Ensign House
Battersea Reach
Juniper Drive
London
SW18 1TA
- Phone:
- 02077130730
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window