THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S, MANEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

21 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 25 January 2011: Previously excepted registration
- ST PETER'S CHURCH MANEY PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Rebecca Louise Stephens | Chair | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Logan Jake Pritchard | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Helen Stansbie | Trustee | 15 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dickon John Taylor | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Movita Daphne Dening | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Kimberley Johnson | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Harley | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Fox | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Anthony Wells | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Holland | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Owen Lawrence Cain | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Coombes | Trustee | 06 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Corby Heywood | Trustee | 06 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL HALLAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUPRABHA TAYLOR BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEENA BENSON HEATON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SONIA ELIZABETH CLUCAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL FRANK JENNER JP BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEVILLE GUY BENYON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA ELIZABETH RICHMOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM EVERITT HARLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.73k | £98.41k | £106.88k | £125.96k | £150.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.88k | £95.44k | £122.26k | £121.90k | £121.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.65k | £8.02k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES"
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters Church
Maney Hill Road
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B72 1JJ
- Phone:
- 01213556952
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window