SAINT MAKARIOS THE GREAT ECCLESIASTICAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object is to advance the Christian religion for the benefit of the public in accordance with the doctrines of the Romanian Orthodox Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Cheshire East
- City Of York
- Durham
- Lancashire
- Leeds City
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Sheffield City
- Warrington
Governance
- 15 February 2011: Standard registration
- SMOC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PETRU CIPRIAN NEDELCU | Chair | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
EMANUEL PADUREANU | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Bagrin | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mihai Gabriel Costandache | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.32k | £68.30k | £118.38k | £151.72k | £244.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.49k | £39.02k | £88.21k | £78.59k | £159.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 FEBRUARY 2011 as amended on 15 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE ROMANIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH. 2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 Stanks Drive
Leeds
LS14 5NS
- Phone:
- 07467382255
- Email:
- nedelcupc@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window