WEYMOUTH MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The management of Weymouth Museum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £27,424 from 5 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 07 September 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CANON MARCIA LORRAINE PRITCHARD | Chair | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Anya Lucy Chapman | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Ayling | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Day | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hadyn Beazer | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frederick William Allott | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert William Chedzoy | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Harris | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.72k | £41.52k | £32.92k | £145.87k | £29.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.20k | £72.50k | £27.86k | £106.27k | £72.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £58.50k | £35.68k | £23.10k | N/A | £27.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/11/2010
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A MUSEUM AND HERITAGE CENTRE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY OF THE BOROUGH OF WEYMOUTH AND PORTLAND AND THE REMAINDER OF THE COUNTY OF DORSET AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND ALL PURPOSES ANCILLARY THERETO.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Ullswater Crescent
WEYMOUTH
Dorset
DT3 5HE
- Phone:
- 07971597860
- Email:
- bob.chedzoy16@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window