Trustees WEYMOUTH MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1143692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CANON MARCIA LORRAINE PRITCHARD Chair 22 February 2012
None on record
Anya Lucy Chapman Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Emma Ayling Trustee 20 July 2024
None on record
Diane Day Trustee 14 June 2024
None on record
Anthony Hadyn Beazer Trustee 21 December 2023
None on record
Frederick William Allott Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
Robert William Chedzoy Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
David Harris Trustee 08 July 2019
SPARK
Received: 132 days late