NUS STUDENTS' UNION CHARITABLE SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is responsible for supporting the development of students' unions throughout the country to ensure they adequately serve their student membership.It's objectives are the promotion of students' unions for the benefit of the public including promoting the efficiency and effectiveness of students' unions and building the capacity of the students' union sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£3,930,395
Donations and legacies | £206.33k | |
Charitable activities | £303.24k | |
Other trading activities | £2.59m | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £827.38k |
Total expenditure:
£3,433,919
Raising funds | £1.27m | |
Charitable activities | £2.16m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £227,162 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.27m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.16m | |
Retained for future use | £496.48k |
People

35 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Manpreet Kaur Dhesi | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Deio Owen | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sai Shraddha Suresh Viswanathan | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Qasim Hussain | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Stanley | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Innes | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mx Noah Katz | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Kirkpatrick | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ABBY WILSON | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Hughes | Trustee | 08 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Kerton | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Chapman | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.67m | £1.12m | £3.51m | £3.80m | £3.93m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.83m | £1.54m | £3.51m | £3.80m | £3.43m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £758.29k | £389.84k | £353.00k | £227.16k | £227.16k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.44m | £389.84k | £447.67k | £227.16k | £206.33k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £2.19m | £2.53m | £2.59m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £892.26k | £127.24k | £228.36k | £385.20k | £303.24k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £1.34m | £599.57k | £643.85k | £656.29k | £827.38k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.83m | £1.54m | £2.12m | £2.05m | £2.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £1.34m | £1.75m | £1.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £123.20k | £73.01k | £78.18k | £154.59k | £189.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £47.96k | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £469.31k | £288.50k | £184.16k | £127.90k | £333.89k | |
|
Long-term investments | £277.46k | £277.46k | £20 | £20 | £20 | |
|
Other assets | £4.18m | £3.44m | £8.95m | £8.91m | £6.93m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.15m | £3.65m | £5.33m | £5.27m | £3.03m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED 28 JANUARY 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 OCT 2017 as amended on 30 Jun 2020 as amended on 30 Jun 2020 as amended on 07 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
6. Objects The objects are to further all charitable purposes, including (without limitation): 6.1 the promotion of the efficiency and effectiveness of charities and voluntary organisations including students’ unions; 6.2 the promotion of good citizenship; 6.3 the advancement of education of students; 6.4 the promotion for the benefit of the public of the conservation, protection and improvement of the environment; and 6.5 the promotion of equality and diversity. 6.6 In this objects clause, “charitable purposes” means purposes which are charitable in every part of the United Kingdom. Nothing in this objects clause shall authorise an application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable in accordance with section 7 of the Charities and Trustee Investment (Scotland) Act 2005.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merseyway Innovation Centre
21-23 Merseyway
Stockport
SK1 1PN
- Phone:
- 0300 303 8602
- Email:
- membership@nus.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window