BENTLEY HALL BARN BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) For the benefit of the public the preservation, maintenance, repair and improvement of Bentley Hall Barn 2) To protect, preserve and conserve the population of bats that use Bentley Hall Barn and its environment 3) To advance the education of the public in the preservation project of Bentley Hall Barn, and the bat conservation project
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Suffolk
Governance
- 08 September 2011: Standard registration
- 23 May 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- BENTLEY HALL BARN BPT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £6 | £6 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/08/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27/06/2011
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BENTLEY HALL BARN SITUATED IN BABERGH DISTRICT, SUFFOLK, A GRADE II* LISTED BUILDING. 2) TO PROTECT, PRESERVE AND CONSERVE THE POPULATION OF BATS THAT USE BENTLEY HALL BARN AND ITS ENVIRONMENT. 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRESERVATION PROJECT OF BENTLEY HALL BARN, AND THE BAT CONSERVATION. PROJECT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window