CONNECTED LIFE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular open public worship. Pastoral work,among sick and bereaved. Teaching Christianity through sermons, courses, small groups. Youth club with Christian ethos. Promoting Christianity by staging events, meetings, and distribution of literature. Promoting mission via provision of activities for senior citizens, parents toddlers and special need groups. Supporting mission in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 13 January 2011: Standard registration
- GEORGE ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH ERDINGTON (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Bara | Chair | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Refina Ferreira | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicolae Marin | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Dogar | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avram Satmari | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Estera Bucur | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark Kwabia | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicolai Mihai | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Campbell | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Ellen Carter | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ELIZABETH MORTON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andy Thewles | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.98k | £111.23k | £98.98k | £212.57k | £176.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.44k | £83.31k | £80.63k | £76.05k | £146.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOVEMBER 2009 as amended on 29 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Connected Life Church
George Road
Erdington
BIRMINGHAM
B23 7RY
- Phone:
- 0121 682 0125
- Email:
- baradaniel@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window