Trustees CONNECTED LIFE CHURCH
Charity number: 1139836

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Bara | Chair | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Refina Ferreira | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicolae Marin | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Dogar | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avram Satmari | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Estera Bucur | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark Kwabia | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicolai Mihai | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Campbell | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Ellen Carter | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ELIZABETH MORTON | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andy Thewles | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.