METTA THEATRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We stage theatrical productions of the highest quality, pushing the boundaries of artistic practice. As well as full productions in theatres, we carry out work such as rehearsed readings and location based pieces such as performances in non-theatrical spaces. We work collaboratively with artists from different fields to make interdisciplinary work that is socially engaged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 February 2011: Standard registration
- METTA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucinda Walker | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Nadif | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leah Michaels | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Lane | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR WILL REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £408.58k | £71.50k | £80.71k | £206.04k | £55.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £549.81k | £97.53k | £170.27k | £85.60k | £41.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £96.17k | N/A | £31.71k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/09/2015 as amended on 30 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE ARTS AND CULTURE BY STAGING, PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THEATRICAL PRODUCTIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND (II) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THEATRICAL ARTS (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, MUSIC, MIME, DANCE, CIRCUS, OPERA, PUPPETRY, AND STORY-TELLING);
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Jubilee Cottages
Hemington
RADSTOCK
BA3 5XU
- Phone:
- 07717821232
- Email:
- info@mettatheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window