RESTORE TRUTH OUTREACH MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHARITY FOR THE COMMUNITY TO PROMOTE CHRISTIAN ACTS OF WORSHIP, PRAYERS, COUNSELLING AND OUTREACH WORK INT HE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 December 2010: Standard registration
- RTOM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
EVETTE CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/08/2019 | 29/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.17k | £23.90k | £22.78k | £28.77k | £21.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.51k | £23.42k | £20.84k | £27.51k | £24.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2023 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 August 2020 | 28 July 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 August 2019 | 28 July 2021 | 394 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2019 | 28 July 2021 | 394 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 29 AUG 2010
Charitable objects
The objects of the Church (¶the Objects÷) are for the benefit of the public: (a) to advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement in such ways and in such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Church Council from time to time may think fit; (b) to relieve sickness and financial hardship and to promote and preserve good health by the provision of funds, goods or services of any kind including through the provision of counselling and support in such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Church Council from time to time think fit; and (c) to advance education in such ways and in such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Church Council form time to time may think fit.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 OAKMEAD ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 3AS
- Phone:
- +447538999320
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window