BOISHAKHI MELA COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The orgainsation's main object is to educate general public in Bangladeshi arts and culture. The organisation will hold annual events (Mela) in Brick Lane, London E1 (ie. 'Bangla Town'). This is similar to a carnival where there will be music, dancing and many stalls promoting mainly Bangladeshi culture, arts, music and food.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 August 2011: Standard registration
- 25 January 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2012 | 30/11/2013 | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £261.96k | £264.61k | £410.14k | £148.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300.45k | £389.35k | £230.12k | £148.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 18 October 2016 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | 18 September 2017 | 353 days late | |
Annual return | 30 November 2014 | 22 October 2015 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2014 | 25 January 2016 | 117 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/11/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05/08/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BENGALI ARTS AND CULTURE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY HOLDING AN ANNUAL OPEN AIR EVENT KNOWN AS BOISHAKHI MELA (BENGALI NEW YEAR FESTIVAL) WHERE PEOPLE CAN LEARN ABOUT AND PARTICIPATE IN THE ARTS. TO ORGANISE AND PROMOTE CULTURAL & SPORTING EVENTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window