JUBILEE COMMUNITY CHURCH (MAIDENHEAD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian Church with a view to serving the community in which we are based and further afield through missionary work. We provide activities for all age groups within our community on a regular basis throughout the week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 14 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Felgate | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Gunn | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Michael Edward Dauncey | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ben Dale | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EASTON | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL John CAMERON | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
RONALD FLEMING | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|||||
STUART PETER OTTO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN RUTH SEDDON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £370.11k | £311.90k | £351.81k | £449.58k | £408.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £313.04k | £292.48k | £249.12k | £341.34k | £385.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST UNION [DENOMINATION] AND THE CHARITY MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jubilee Community Church
The Kidwells Centre
41 Marlow Road
MAIDENHEAD
SL6 7AQ
- Phone:
- 01628627194
- Email:
- office@jcchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window