Financial history SLUMDOCTOR PROJECT

Charity number: 1140318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.68k £19.32k £13.10k £15.17k £13.83k
Total expenditure £16.84k £9.52k £18.83k £16.81k £14.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A