DEBBIE PLOWMAN HAPPY FACE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote and project the physical and mental health of persons suffering from serious spinal injury through the provision of financial assistance, support, education and practical advice. To advance the education of the public and medical professionals on the subject of spinal injuries and to promote spinal research for the public benefit and to publish the useful results.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
- Sheffield City
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 February 2011: Standard registration
- 15 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.01k | £4.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.41k | £11.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 30 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 31 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 31 October 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 30 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SERIOUS SPINAL INJURY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF THE FOLLOWING FACILITIES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES: 1. PRINCESS ROYAL SPINAL INJURIES UNIT, NORTHERN GENERAL HOSPITAL, OSBORNE BUILDING, HERRIES ROAD, SHEFFIELD S5 7AU 2. LASCELLES NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION UNIT, HIGHGATE PARK, HARROGATE HG1 4PA
Area of benefit
PRINCESS ROYAL SPINAL INJURIES UNIT, NORTHERN GENERAL HOSPITAL, OSBORNE BUILDING, HERRIES ROAD, SHEFFIELD. LASCELLES NEUROLOGICAL REHABILITATION UNIT, HIGHGATE PARK, HARROGATE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window