THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, WANDSWORTH COMMON, LONDON, SW17 7HP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral care, including visiting those in hospital, prison, care homes and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Supporting local schools and charites in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 22 February 2011: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY MAGDALENE TRINITY ROAD SW17 (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Mitchell | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Janet MITCHELL | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY MELLOR TONGE | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Carrington Brook | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles CONGDON | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Malcolm Mitchell | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah PARSONS | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA PEARL PATTINSON | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas William Mortemore Higton | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte FLOWERS | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew HEARD | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richenda TONGE | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sam PARKER | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALICIA HELEN ROSE DREWITT | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ann Cooper | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.96k | £222.92k | £164.06k | £178.14k | £226.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.68k | £216.71k | £177.35k | £159.12k | £170.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £4.00k | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10a Wiseton Road
LONDON
SW17 7EE
- Phone:
- 020867222026
- Email:
- info@smmwandsworth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.