WYTHENSHAWE COMMUNITY MEDIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WCM objects are: (1) To advance education of the public primarily within Greater Manchester in media production and related skills. (2) To develop capacity and skills of socially and economically disadvantaged communities primarily within Wythenshawe and surrounding parts of Greater Manchester so they can better identify, and help meet, their needs and to participate more fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Trafford
Governance
- 01 September 2011: Standard registration
- WYTHENSHAWE FM (Working name)
- WFM COMMUNITY MEDIA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATH FORDEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dennis Phillips | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Eddie Flanagan | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Colin Owen | Trustee | 18 January 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.95k | £18.51k | £11.17k | £17.70k | £11.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.92k | £18.12k | £11.29k | £19.15k | £10.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 July 2021 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 03 April 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01/08/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN GREATER MANCHESTER IN MEDIA PRODUCTION AND RELATED SKILLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 WESTFIELD ROAD
MANCHESTER
M21 0SW
- Phone:
- 01614997982
- Email:
- info@wfmradio.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window