Hippo Pools Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
'People & Wildlife in Harmony' We work in partnership with subsistence farmers in the Umfurudzi area of Zimbabwe, creating wildlife reserves on leased communal land. At the same time we lift their standards of living through education, health, infrastructure and employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 17 March 2011: Standard registration
- HIPPO POOLS TRUST (Working name)
- AMBUYA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE HON SALLY JANE PLUMMER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Vladimir Rockingham-Gill | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA TRINETTE MCHUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TANA TIPPING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD FOX LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER SUZANNE KINGSLEY-HEATH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £624.66k | £199.61k | £165.94k | £252.99k | £255.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £644.13k | £331.10k | £262.60k | £175.08k | £174.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £624.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £350 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £644.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £642.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUL 2016 as amended on 01 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
(A) FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS LIVING IN RURAL AREAS OF SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY: (I) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE AGRICULTURAL PROJECTS IN THE AREA AND PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS WITHIN THE COMMUNITY, (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY IMPROVING THE CAPACITY OF EXISTING SCHOOLS AND PROMOTING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF NEW SCHOOLS AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES. (III) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SPONSORING SPECIFIC PROJECTS TO IMPROVE PUBLIC HEALTH, PROVIDING RELIEF TO AIDS ORPHANS AND DISABLED CHILDREN. (IV) THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF WILDLIFE HABITANTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. (B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLTOP
MIDFORD LANE
LIMPLEY STOKE
BATH
BA2 7GR
- Phone:
- 01225722402
- Email:
- Sally@hippopoolstrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window