THE HANCOCKS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes. Trustees Do Not accept any unsolicited applications
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES CARL HANCOCKS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANTONIA RACHEL HANCOCKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.33k | £115.02k | £33.00k | £48.83k | £32.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.18k | £115.42k | £33.00k | £49.23k | £334.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTDEED 30 NOV 2010
Charitable objects
"FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR DISCRETION EACH YEAR ( OR MORE FREQUENTLY ) SELECT. CHARITABLE PURPOSES HAVE THE MEANINGS GIVEN TO THEM IN THE CHARITIES ACT 2006
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 0117 313 8200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window