Financial history UNIVERSAL HINDU CULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1141593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £35.14k £125 £48.00k £24.00k £24.00k
Total expenditure £41.62k £0 £44.38k £25.69k £25.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A