MAENDELEO TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maendeleo Trust works to support the education of individuals in Sub-Saharan Africa, primarily in Tanzania, but also those undertaking higher level research studies on topics of relevance to Tanzania.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ghana
- Tanzania
Governance
- 03 March 2011: Standard registration
- 22 August 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 August 2019: Funds transferred to 1169474 The Creator Share Foundation
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.05k | £66.57k | £116.41k | £88.57k | £11.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.61k | £66.13k | £118.83k | £94.61k | £12.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 28 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 03 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | 03 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 22 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | 22 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 29 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | 29 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO PERSONS LIVING IN TANZANIA AND PERSONS OF TANZANIAN ORIGIN NOW LIVING IN THE UK
Area of benefit
TANZANIA AND PERSONS OF TANZANIAN ORIGING LIVING IN THE UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window