MISTLEY KIDS CLUB LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of Mistley Kids Club Limited are to provide the necessary facilities for the daily care, recreation and education of children during out of school hours and school holidays. Also, to advance the education and training of the persons engaged in the provision of such care, education and recreational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £302,559 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 08 February 2011: Standard registration
- 10 September 2012: Funds received from 1071360 MISTLEY NORMAN KIDS CLUB
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEMARY SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Rebecca Kenneison | Trustee | 25 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Paul Howard Greenland | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Timothy Parker | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|||||
MRS N MOXEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.58k | £217.69k | £262.58k | £372.85k | £457.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £234.55k | £215.63k | £247.00k | £361.04k | £448.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £59.50k | £128.86k | £186.58k | £183.95k | £302.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 October 2020 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 October 2020 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 04 AUG 2010
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FO THE PERSONS PROVIDING SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mistley Kids Club
Village Hall
Furze Hill
Mistley
CO11 1HS
- Phone:
- 07809176252
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window