OUSEBURN FARM CHARITY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ouseburn Farm, situated in the East End of Newcastle, is a free visitor attraction that boasts an award winning environmentally friendly visitor centre, pigs, sheep, goats, chickens, rabbits, guinea pigs, meadows, ponds and woodlands. The Farm offers training to vulnerable adults, volunteering opportunities for local people and a range of activities for families and schoolchildren.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,596 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
438 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 27 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Brown | Chair | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Esther Anne Gillespie | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ryan David Harland | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Firth | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillippa Catherine Chaplin | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peter Ross | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Kirkham | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Bramley | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Hartley | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Turner | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £563.37k | £430.35k | £402.89k | £445.47k | £458.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £551.10k | £358.13k | £401.02k | £441.98k | £440.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £36.21k | £29.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £100.00k | £42.44k | £38.13k | £9.95k | £3.60k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £327.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £120.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £115.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £17.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £526.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £24.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: A) ADVANCING EDUCATION BY PROVIDING SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL, AGRICULTURAL, ENVIRONMENTAL, ART, CRAFT, TRAINING AND WORKSHOP FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT. B) RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND WORKSHOP FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. SILAS CHURCH
CLIFFORD STREET
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE6 1PG
- Phone:
- 01912658621
- Email:
- info@ouseburnfarm.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window